Register of Interests
Last updated September 2023
NAME | POSITION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | TERM OF OFFICE | APPOINTED BY | BUSINESS & FINANCIAL INTERESTS |
MEMBERS | |||||
J. Gospel |
Member | 21/03/2018 | 20/03/2026 | Appointed by Members | Member of NAHT |
D. Griffiths | Member | 15/11/2021 | 14/11/2025 | Appointed by Members | None Declared |
S. Kauser |
Member | 12/03/2024 | 11/03/2028 | Appointed by Members | None Declared |
K. Mullan |
Member | 12/06/2019 | 10/06/2027 | Appointed by Members | None Declared |
S. Taylor |
Member | 12/06/2019 | 11/06/2027 | Appointed by Members | Trustee of Robin Hood MAT |
NAME | POSITION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | TERM OF OFFICE | APPOINTED BY | BUSINESS & FINANCIAL INTERESTS |
TRUSTEES | |||||
A. Ward |
Chair of Trustees | 17/11/2020 | 16/11/2024 | Appointed by Academy Members | Chair - TS Sherbourne Sea Cadets. Chair - Birmingham Air Raids Remembrance Association. Member of the Labour Party. |
J. Matthiae |
Vice Chair of Trustees | 12/06/2019 | 10/06/2027 | Appointed by Academy Members | None Declared |
J. Greenwood |
CEA & Trustee | 18/11/2013 | Appointed by Foundation Trust | Member of Robin Hood MAT | |
M. Aikhlaq |
Trustee | 18/11/2023 | 16/11/2025 | Appointed by Foundation Trust | Member of the Labour Party. Member of Unite the Union. |
R. Cummins |
Trustee | 09/10/2023 | 08/10/2027 | Appointed by Academy Members |
Citizen Rep - BSOL ICP Grants Panel Hodgehill NNS |
N. Rasheed |
Trustee | 27/03/2023 | 26/03/2027 | Appointed by Academy Members | None Declared |
S. Raybould |
Trustee | 18/11/2013 | 16/11/2025 | Appointed by Foundation Trust | None Declared |
A. Siddiqa |
Trustee | 25/06/2019 | 24/06/2027 | Appointed by Academy Members | None Declared |
LEIGH TRUST GOVERNANCE PROFESSIONAL | |||||
Ms Yvonne Wakefield |
|||||
|
|||||
RESIGNED (LAST 12 MONTHS) | POSITION | RESIGNATION DATE | |||
M. Edwards | Member | 11/06/2023 | |||
M. Ali | Trustee | 19/09/2023 | |||
A. Ward | Member | 18/03/2024 |